U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Triplett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Non-Appeal]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 20, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
October, 2024
  • October 12, 2024: [Remark]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 09, 2024: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 08, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.