U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pruett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Postpone Sentencing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2025
  • January 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Motions Referred]
  • September 30, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.