U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00113-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Maxie, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • April 16, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 10, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2025
  • February 24, 2025: [Order]
November, 2024
  • November 20, 2024: [Sever Defendant]
  • November 20, 2024: [Change Venue]
  • November 11, 2024: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 23, 2024: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 21, 2024: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Filing Exhibits]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • October 02, 2024: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 02, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing]
  • October 01, 2024: [Document Referred]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 30, 2024: [Detention Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.