U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. REESE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 11, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 10, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 10, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Information - Felony]
  • October 08, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.