U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez-Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [USCA Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 08, 2024: [Appeal Instructions]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 07, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2024: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • October 02, 2024: [Document Referred]
  • October 01, 2024: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.