U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00320-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smiley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • April 01, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • March 25, 2025: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 21, 2025: [Seal]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.