U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00197-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCGOWAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 23, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 16, 2025: [Variance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 02, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 02, 2024: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 01, 2024: [Continue Trial - Ends of Justice]
  • October 01, 2024: [Continue Trial]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.