U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scruggs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 26, 2024: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
October, 2024
  • October 13, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order to Produce]
  • October 03, 2024: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 01, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.