U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hollis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 30, 2025: [Amend/Correct ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2025: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • April 29, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 29, 2025: [Appeal Instructions]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sentencing]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 20, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.