U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00288-1
  • Case Name: USA v. YULE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Variance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 07, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
November, 2024
  • November 15, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 11, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 11, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Detention]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.