U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ferris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Seal Document]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Document Referred]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.