U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 03, 2025: [Postpone Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 11, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.