U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00125-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodgers et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of 404(b) Evidence]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 27, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue-Ends of Justice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Conference]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Document Referred]
  • October 09, 2024: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 09, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.