U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frazier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of 404(b) Evidence]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 21, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Appear]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.