U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00367-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NELSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • April 21, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appeal Instructions]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 14, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 10, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • April 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to Court Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 02, 2025: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
October, 2024
  • October 21, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 10, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 10, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 10, 2024: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • October 10, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2024: [Arrest ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Detention]
  • October 10, 2024: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.