U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hayden
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 10, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Non-Appeal]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Document Referred]
October, 2024
  • October 22, 2024: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.