U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00427-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOCK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to Court Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • April 02, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 02, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • April 02, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 02, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 02, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue Trial - Ends of Justice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 31, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Use Evidence]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order to Produce Prisoner for Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
November, 2024
  • November 05, 2024: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.