U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00438-1
  • Case Name: USA v. POWELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • March 13, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 12, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2025: [Continue Trial]
November, 2024
  • November 11, 2024: [Continue Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.