U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00157-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 20, 2025: [Amend/Correct ]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
January, 2025
  • January 07, 2025: [Reconsideration ]
November, 2024
  • November 17, 2024: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.