U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00297-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DUDLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 28, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 27, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 25, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 24, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • March 24, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • March 24, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 24, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
November, 2024
  • November 21, 2024: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.