U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00290-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GILBERT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 07, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 03, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2024
  • November 21, 2024: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.