U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00216-13
  • Case Name: USA v. YNIRIO-SANCHEZ, ET AL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • April 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • April 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • April 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • April 14, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 11, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 09, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 09, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • April 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • April 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 08, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • April 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 08, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • April 03, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • April 03, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 01, 2025: [Variance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 27, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • March 27, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • March 27, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • March 26, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 26, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • March 26, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • March 25, 2025: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • March 25, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 24, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • March 20, 2025: [Release from Custody]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • March 19, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extend Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • March 14, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 14, 2025: [Appeal Instructions]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 13, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 13, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 11, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Variance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 10, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2025
  • January 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2024
  • December 11, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.