U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams-Beverly et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 08, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 08, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • March 21, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 13, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 13, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
February, 2025
  • February 05, 2025: [Arraignment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.