U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00199-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peters et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Seal Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 25, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • April 10, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
February, 2025
  • February 06, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.