U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GARROTT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response to Court Order]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • March 11, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 10, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2025
  • February 11, 2025: [Suppress]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.