U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00474-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sica-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
February, 2025
  • February 21, 2025: [Expedite Sentencing]
  • February 20, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.