U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00020-6
  • Case Name: USA v. Watts, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 22, 2025: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 02, 2025: [Arrest - Other District]
  • April 02, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • March 19, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 19, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2025
  • February 26, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.