U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00194
  • Case Name: Scarborough et al v. Travelers Personal Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.