U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00190-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robles et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Consent Plea Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • April 30, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 14, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 18, 2025: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Commitment to Another District]
  • March 18, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order to Produce Prisoner for Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.