U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00152
  • Case Name: Cowley v. Dwell Students (Auburn), LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • April 10, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply Brief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 01, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 18, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • March 18, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice to Counsel]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Remand]
  • March 11, 2025: [Remand]
  • March 11, 2025: [Complaint, Amended]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.