U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00191
  • Case Name: Burkett v. Ivey (MAG+)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice to Counsel]
  • March 11, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.