U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cobb
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Indictment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of 404(b) Evidence]
  • April 02, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 02, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.