U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00216-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barlow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 27, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.