U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00013-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Campbell et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Conference]
  • March 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.