U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00086
  • Case Name: Carter v. Buzbee et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 11, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order - Document NOTED]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 28, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 24, 2025: [Answer due deadline]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 11, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.