U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Howell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Seal Document]
  • March 28, 2025: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Arraignment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.