U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 25, 2025: [Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.