U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00457
  • Case Name: Smith III v. NC Financial Solutions of Alabama, LLC, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Dismissing Parties]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Endorsement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Dismissing Parties]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Dismissing Parties]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.