U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00169
  • Case Name: CM Ventures, Inc. et al v. Urban Wok, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Alias Summons]
  • April 22, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 01, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.