U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00070
  • Case Name: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Thomason
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 16, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Objection]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.