U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00193
  • Case Name: Sharpe v. Community Veterinary Clinics, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • May 02, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 28, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 12, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.