U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00508
  • Case Name: United States of America ex rel. Bonnie Brooks v. Comfort Care Hospice, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 12, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.