U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00196
  • Case Name: Vanderpool v. Houston County Jail et al (INMATE 2)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2025: [Return Receipt Card]
  • April 03, 2025: [Return Receipt Card]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Return Receipt Card]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order to File Special Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit]
  • March 12, 2025: [Inmate 1983 Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.