U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00143
  • Case Name: Harmon v. Rahming (INMATE 2)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 18, 2025: [AO FORM 85]
  • April 18, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 11, 2025: [Produce]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 18, 2025: [Return Receipt Card]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order to File Special Report]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.