U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00129
  • Case Name: Smith v. Harper et al (MAG+)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 13, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • March 12, 2025: [More Definite Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.