U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00198
  • Case Name: Sexton v. Williams et al (INMATE 2)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [AO FORM 85]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer]
  • May 01, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Return Receipt Card]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order to File Special Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit]
  • March 12, 2025: [Inmate 1983 Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.