U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00090
  • Case Name: Falkner et al v. Ovum Medical, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 28, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 27, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 27, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 27, 2025: [Remand]
  • March 14, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order - Document NOTED]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 12, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.