U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sopson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 07, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 04, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 13, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Arraignment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.