U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • April 25, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 25, 2025: [Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • March 12, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Arraignment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.