U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00109
  • Case Name: Estate of John Martin Campbell v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 14, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • March 14, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Remand]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.